BRAILLE GUILD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Teach sighted people to create and understand Braille code ( ie learning the language) with the aim to transcribe text into Braille for mainly local blind children and adults. Qualified Braille members produce Braille publications on an ongoing basis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barnsley
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Doncaster
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 05 November 1992: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Val Trickey | Trustee | 15 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Sead | Trustee | 15 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN HENRY | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
MAY NOCK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £730 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £228 | £691 | £691 | £590 | £1.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 May 2024 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 JUNE 1992 AS AMENDED 6 OCTOBER 1992 AND 16 JUNE 1998
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF THE BLIND AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY PROVIDING A TRAINING SERVICE FOR SIGHTED PERSONS TO LEARN BRAILLE (B) BRAILLE GUILD OPERATES AN EQUAL OPPORTUNITIES POLICY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
182 FEATHERSTONE LANE
FEATHERSTONE
PONTEFRACT
WF7 6AD
- Phone:
- 01924277493
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window