LONDON CHRISTIAN FAMILY FAITH TABERNACLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN FAITH & THE WORSHIP OF GOD & THE PREACHING AND PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL. 2. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK OR DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN. 3. ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

2 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout London
- Botswana
- Ireland
- Kenya
- South Africa
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 05 November 1992: Standard registration
- CHRISTIAN FAMILY FAITH TABERNACLE (Previous name)
- LONDON CHRISTIAN FAMILY FAITH TABERNACLE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GERALD MHLANGA | Trustee | 17 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
REVEREND PATRICK JAMES MWANAKA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.05k | £16.50k | £21.90k | £24.50k | £21.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.00k | £17.00k | £22.00k | £24.05k | £21.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 546 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 546 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 November 2022 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 November 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21ST OF OCTOBER 1992.
Charitable objects
(I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE SCHEDULE ANNEXED TO THE GOVERNING INSTRUMENT AND THE WORSHIP OF GOD AND THE PREACHING AND PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL AND THE TEACHING OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES AND THE PASTORAL CARE OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE AND THE PRINTING AND DISTRIBUTION OF THE BIBLE AND CHRISTIAN LITERATURE; (II) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK; (III) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ON THE BASIS OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE PROVISION OF SUCH EDUCATION IN ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS AND IF THE TRUSTEES SO DECIDE THE PROVISION OF ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS FOR THE GENERAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OR ADULTS ON THE BASIS OF SUCH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES.
Area of benefit
LONDON IN PRACTICE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 24
Stapleford
Willan Road
London
N17 6NA
- Phone:
- 07956996240
- Email:
- pastorpjmwanaka@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window