THE CASS SCULPTURE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation promotes the general public's knowledge and appreciation of the arts in society by the establishment, maintenance and preservation of a collection of contemporary sculptures and work of art representative of the range and diversity of sculptures as an art form, a sculpture setting exhibiting the collection to the public and a Foundation Centre for lectures and exhibitions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2020
Total income:
£1,560,151
Donations and legacies | £890.06k | |
Charitable activities | £670.05k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £44 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£947,627
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £910.16k | |
Other | £37.47k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £37.47k | |
Charitable expenditure | £910.16k | |
Retained for future use | £612.52k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 06 November 1992: Standard registration
- 31 March 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SCULPTURE AT GOODWOOD (Working name)
- THE HAT HILL SCULPTURE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 30/09/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £952.88k | £447.18k | £1.17m | £556.55k | £1.56m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.22m | £1.22m | £1.75m | £2.11m | £947.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £117.22k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.00k | N/A | £241.76k | £14.32k | £890.06k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £949.93k | N/A | £928.09k | £542.21k | £670.05k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £227 | N/A | £483 | £25 | £44 | |
|
Income - Other | £729 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.22m | N/A | £1.74m | £2.10m | £910.16k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £2.75k | N/A | £4.64k | £19 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.67k | N/A | £11.54k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | £10.80k | £37.47k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 30/09/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.24m | N/A | £384.36k | £355.12k | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.21m | N/A | £1.86m | £407.37k | £110.16k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £880.11k | N/A | £1.30m | £1.38m | £110.16k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 03 March 2021 | 397 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 03 March 2021 | 397 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 15 January 2020 | 349 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 20 December 2019 | 323 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 08 February 2018 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 31 January 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 SEPTEMBER 1992 AND AMENDED 28 APRIL 2004.
Charitable objects
1)THE PROMOTION OF THE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS IN SOCIETY BY THE ESTABLISHMENT MAINTENANCE AND PRESERVATION OF I)A COLLECTION OF SCULPTURES REPRESENTATIVE OF THE RANGE AND DIVERSITY OF SCULPTURES AS AN ART FORM TO THE INTENT THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL AQUIRE SELL EXCHANGE AND OTHERWISE DEAL IN SCULPTURES TO ENSURE (IN SO FAR AS POSSIBLE) THAT THE COLLECTION IS AND REMAINS PREDOMINANTLY REPRESENTATIVE OF CONTEMPORARY SCULPTURE FROM TIME TO TIME II)A SCULPTURE SETTING COMPRISING ALL OR PART OF THE GROUNDS TO THE HOUSE AND EXHIBIT THE COLLECTION OF SCULPTURES TO THE PUBLIC III)A COLLECTION OF WORKS OF ART (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO SCULPTURES) TO BE SITUATED IN THE HOUSE KNOWN AS HAT HILL COPSE IF AT ANY TIME SUCH HOUSE SHALL BE VESTED IN THE TRUSTEES TO BE EXHIBITED TO THE PUBLIC AT THE TRUSTEES DISCRETION EITHER ALONE OR IN CONJUNCTION WITH ANY EXHIBITION OF THE COLLECTION OF SCULPTURES IN THE GROUND IV)A THEATRE AT HAT HILL COPSE FOR USE OF GIVING LECTURES IN CONNECTION WITH SCULPTURES AND OTHER WORKS OF ART OR FOR THE PERFORMANCE OF DRAMATIC WORKS WHETHER OR NOT CONNECTED WITH THE COLLECTION OF SCULPTURES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE SOUTHERN ENGLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window