VENTURE FARM CAT RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rescuing, caring for and rehoming cats (and some other animals) at the farm. Ensuring they are all neutered and providing support where necessary.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 06 November 1992: Standard registration
- VENTURE FARM ANIMAL TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SYLVIA HOPWOOD | Chair | 13 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Meryl Marshall | Trustee | 23 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janice Carolyn Stubbs | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL GERALDINE HATTON | Trustee | 24 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH O'BRIEN | Trustee | 24 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £297.59k | £159.37k | £368.99k | £155.72k | £184.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.45k | £131.86k | £149.05k | £180.66k | £246.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £29.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2 SEPTEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 21 MARCH 1997, 11 FEBRUARY 2007 AND 8 AUGUST 2008
Charitable objects
TO PREVENT CRUELTY AND TO RELIEVE SUFFERING OF ALL ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE GREAT BRITAIN
Contact information
- Address:
-
VENTURE FARM
THUXTON ROAD
MATTISHALL
DEREHAM
NR20 3LB
- Phone:
- 01362850352
- Email:
- venturefarm@virginmedia.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window