Financial history REDHILL CHRISTIAN CENTRE (SIDNEY AND EVELYN SAVAGE TRUST)

Charity Number: 1015118
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £154.74k £164.62k £322.53k £150.46k £180.29k
Total expenditure £152.38k £120.03k £146.42k £155.97k £176.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £50.42k N/A N/A N/A