REDHILL CHRISTIAN CENTRE (SIDNEY AND EVELYN SAVAGE TRUST)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides a centre for spiritual and physical refreshment for individuals and groups by offering short term breaks for individuals, married couples and small groups. It also provides facilities for larger non-residential groups for worship and meetings, and also conference facilities for secular groups compatible with Christian values eg, NHS trusts, hospices and many voluntary services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 09 November 1992: Standard registration
- 16 September 2015: Funds received from 1069824 WORD OF LIFE (STRATFORD-UPON-AVON) CHRISTIAN CENTR...
- REDHILL CHRISTIAN CENTRE (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER TIMMS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Hazel Christina Parrock | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Webb | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas William Brooker | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mark Kirby | Trustee | 28 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
THE REVD DR MICHAEL MORRIS WATKINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £154.74k | £164.62k | £322.53k | £150.46k | £180.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £152.38k | £120.03k | £146.42k | £155.97k | £176.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £50.42k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5 OCTOBER 1992
Charitable objects
FURTHERANCE OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL BY THE PROVISION OF CARING, COUNSELLING, HEALING AND TEACHING MINISTRY AND THROUGH THE HOLDING OF SERVICES AND MEETINGS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 WILKES WAY
BIDFORD-ON-AVON
ALCESTER
B50 4QA
- Phone:
- 01789731427
- Email:
- sheilacollie@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window