Governing document QUEENS GURKHA SIGNALS TRUST FUND

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15TH SEPTEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION 1 NOVEMBER 2002 AND BY RESOLUTIONS EFFECTIVE 15 SEPTEMBER 2008 AND BY SECOND DEED OF VARIATION 26 SEPTEMBER 2008 as amended on 25 Apr 2018 as amended on 08 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY OF THE QUEENS GURKHA SIGNALS AND THE MAINTENANCE OF ITS HISTORY, TRADITIONS AND ESPRIT DE CORPS. (B) THE PURCHASE OF SUCH CHATTELS AND OTHER PROPERTY AS IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES IS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE REGIMENT OR OF ANY UNIT FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE REGIMENT AND THE INSURANCE AND UPKEEP OF ANY PROPERTY FOR THE TIME BEING BELONGING TO THE REGIMENT OR ANY SUCH UNIT. (C) OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES PROMOTING THE EFFICIENCY OR ESPRIT DE CORPS OF ALL RANKS OF OR SERVING WITH THE REGIMENT. (D) THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS HARDSHIP OR POVERTY AMONGST SERVING OR FORMER MEMBERS OF THE REGIMENT OR THEIR DEPENDANTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.