Accounts and annual returns 28TH DONCASTER ST EDMUNDS SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1015123
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 June 2024 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 25 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required