Accounts and annual returns KEYNOTE TRUST

Charity number: 1015152
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 16 January 2015 21 August 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 16 January 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 19 September 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2012 07 June 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 13 June 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required