KINGSLAND RESIDENTS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kingsland Resisdemts association is responsible the Kingsland Community Centre. Situated on Winton Street, at the heart of Kingsland estate. The centre provides an affordable setting for numerous local groups and organisations. Activities in the centre range from Children's sessions, Sportimg clubs for older children as well as coffee mornings and bingo entertainment for our older residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2020
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
- Southampton City
Governance
- 13 November 1992: Standard registration
- 08 July 2022: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 08 July 2022: Funds transferred to 1130797 WEST ITCHEN COMMUNITY TRUST LIMITED
- Kingsland Community Centre (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2016 | 31/10/2017 | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.59k | £10.70k | £7.70k | £7.68k | £13.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.07k | £9.22k | £5.13k | £5.70k | £8.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 13 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | 26 November 2019 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19TH SEPTEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
(A)TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF KINGSLAND AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B)TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME(WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE KINGSLAND, ST MARY'S, HOLYROOD, SOUTHAMPTON, HAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window