BENTHAM HEALTH CENTRE EXTRA CARE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is used to provide medical equipment, books, information leaflets for patients in the practice and in the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 13 June 1968: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Louise Morgan | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr MAIRI LINDSAY MCKIRDY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr NICHOLAS DAVID HOWLETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.70k | £2.25k | £37.81k | £12.85k | £4.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.43k | £2.80k | £7.02k | £12.85k | £27.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20 JULY 1992
Charitable objects
1.TO PURSUE CHARITABLE PURPOSES ONLY.2.TO IMPROVE THE CARE AVAILABLE TO PATIENTS OF THE BENTHAM GENERAL MEDICAL PRACTICE BY THE PURCHASE OF EQUIPMENT USED IN INVESTIGATION AND/OR TREATMENT OF ILLNESS.3.TO MAINTAIN SUCH EQUIPMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BENTHAM MEDICAL PRACTICE
GRASMERE DRIVE
BENTHAM
LANCASTER
LA2 7JP
- Phone:
- 01524261202
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window