REYNOLDSTON VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision and maintenance of a village hall together with associated activities for the benefit of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £2,090 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 12 November 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HUGH JONES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Emma Stuart Spacey | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Muriel Spacie | Trustee | 17 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Carolyn Moran | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neil Barry | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Stephen Sandles | Trustee | 19 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennie Clements | Trustee | 13 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL VALERIO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ENID JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.77k | £19.33k | £36.72k | £19.03k | £22.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.36k | £16.87k | £41.73k | £19.74k | £20.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £19.00k | £11.60k | £19.05k | £1.48k | £2.09k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 NOVEMBER 1991 AS AMENDED 5 MAY 1992
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE COMMUNITY OF REYNOLDSTON
Area of benefit
COMMUNITY OF REYNOLDSTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
REYNOLDSTON VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION
REYNOLDSTON
SWANSEA
SA3 1AA
- Phone:
- 01792391012
- Email:
- hugh.jones@reynoldston.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window