Trustees REYNOLDSTON VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 1015197

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HUGH JONES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Emma Stuart Spacey | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Muriel Spacie | Trustee | 17 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Carolyn Moran | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neil Barry | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Stephen Sandles | Trustee | 19 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennie Clements | Trustee | 13 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL VALERIO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ENID JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.