WALSALL GILBERT AND SULLIVAN SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Presentation of musical and dramatic entertainment to the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 13 November 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Micklewright | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith Alderson | Trustee | 27 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Sainsbury | Trustee | 27 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Doreen Yates | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Liam Simkins | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARIE MICKLWEWRIGHT | Trustee | 11 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
GARY GENTLE | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR KEN HACKETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.57k | £1.51k | £5.35k | £5.49k | £11.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.27k | £482 | £1.81k | £7.28k | £10.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 February 2025 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 4 MARCH 1992
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS (TO ASSIST AND FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Harrison Close
Cheslyn Hay
WALSALL
WS6 7PD
- Phone:
- 01922646977
- Email:
- kenwrhodes04@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window