Friends of Hampton High

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of Hampton High is the school's PTA. We hold fundraising events such as Christmas or Summer Fairs, Quiz Night, Christmas Tree Sale. This money then feeds back into the school and into projects that are agreed with staff and students.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 13 November 1992: Standard registration
- HCCA (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF HAMPTON ACADEMY (Previous name)
- HAMPTON ACADEMY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- HAMPTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- RECTORY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Wheatley | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steve McGregor | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Horn | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.43k | £2.30k | £4.40k | £7.18k | £5.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.16k | £2.91k | £3.49k | £6.51k | £10.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 09 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02/10/1998 AS AMENDED ON 05/10/1992 AS AMENDED ON 19/10/2010 AS AMENDED ON 17/01/2012 as amended on 17 May 2016 as amended on 17 May 2016
Charitable objects
A) TO SUPPORT THE ACTIVITIES OF THE ACADEMY. B)TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES AT THE ACADEMY FOR THE BENEFIT OF ALL STUDENTS.
Area of benefit
HAMPTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hampton High - Fo
Hanworth Road
HAMPTON
TW12 3HB
- Phone:
- 020 8979 3399
- Email:
- friends@hamptonhigh.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window