DEREK WILLIAMS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust follows its main object to advance public education in and appreciation of the arts by the public display of fine works of art.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 November 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosemary Claire Evans | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sian Llinos Williams | Trustee | 29 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Brendan Edward James Sadka | Trustee | 09 November 2018 |
|
|||||
JAMES RONALD SEATON | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN MYLES DAVIES | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM WILKINS CBE, DL | Trustee | 10 October 2000 |
|
|
||||
JOAN WINTER | Trustee | 21 October 1992 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD JOHN EVANS | Trustee | 21 October 1992 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £334.41k | £283.08k | £290.92k | £244.54k | £213.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £240.96k | £74.83k | £136.02k | £122.06k | £241.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 OCTOBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS BY THE PUBLIC DISPLAY OF FINE WORKS OF ART.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE DEREK WILLIAMS TRUST
4 YNYS BRIDGE COURT
GWAELOD Y GARTH
CARDIFF
CF15 9SS
- Phone:
- 02920814114
- Email:
- info@williams-ross.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window