Accounts and annual returns CASTLE BROMWICH INFANT SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1015259
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2008 18 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 21 October 2008 113 days late
Annual return 31 August 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 Not submitted