BERKSHIRE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting exists to actively engage and support young people in their personal development, empowering them to make a positive contribution to society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
88 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bracknell Forest
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 19 November 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN AITKEN | Chair | 06 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
DOUGLAS CONRAD WALROND | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Brunsdon | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Xavier Davis | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karanvir Mehra | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Conor Chippendale | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Pickett | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Megan Elizabeth Currie | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Williamson | Trustee | 04 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Stuart Ford | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|||||
ROBIN MICHAEL KENT | Trustee | 07 July 2015 |
|
|||||
NIGEL GRAHAM BEVAN | Trustee | 07 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
IAN MAY | Trustee | 08 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £999.28k | £188.40k | £111.17k | £315.17k | £172.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £925.08k | £176.41k | £218.50k | £353.63k | £203.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.34k | £6.50k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £4.70k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £990.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £918.87k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £6.21k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £10.33k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER OF 4 JANUARY 1912 AND SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS DATED 28 MARCH 1949, 18 FEBRUARY 1959, 5 MAY 1967 AND 19 JULY 1991
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIAL AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
BERKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
BERKSHIRE COUNTY SCOUTS
SINDLESHAM COURT
MOLE ROAD
SINDLESHAM
WOKINGHAM
RG41 5EA
- Phone:
- 01182282958
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window