ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF CADOGAN COURT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise money and invite and receive contributions, for the residents of Cadogan Court.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Somerset
Governance
- 26 November 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Arthur Blamey | Trustee | 21 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr William Clarke | Trustee | 21 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GERALD WORTHAM BA FCA | Trustee | 04 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Christopher Dyer | Trustee | 01 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR Steven Rupp | Trustee | 01 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
GORDON WALTER LONG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL SAFFIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.20k | £6.89k | £3.98k | £3.71k | £9.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.68k | £4.51k | £3.06k | £3.01k | £3.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 November 2023 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 JANUARY 1988 AND AMENDED MARCH 1989, 1990, 1991, 23 OCTOBER 1992 AND 2 MARCH 2002
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE RESIDENTS OF CADOGAN COURT BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT OR FACILITIES NOT OTHERWISE PROVIDED FOR.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE RESIDENTS OF CADOGAN COURT, EXETER
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Elm Grove Road
Topsham
EXETER
EX3 0EQ
- Phone:
- 07879672748
- Email:
- leoclarke1@me.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window