READING OLD BLUES ASSOCIATION CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poverty and distress amoung the current and past Trustees, Governers, Staff, Pupils of Aldworth's Hospital The Reading Blue Coat School their dependents or anyone closely connected with the School. To advance the education and religion of pupils at the School. Generally, to support any charitable trusts or organisations and to carry out any charitable purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bracknell Forest
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 23 November 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bob Trew | Trustee | 07 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Cameron Michael Peter Johnson | Trustee | 07 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Robert Anthony Sillitoe | Trustee | 07 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.35k | £6.83k | £5.90k | £6.91k | £7.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.56k | £3.14k | £7.68k | £1.77k | £3.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 07 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 13 September 2021 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 21 September 2020 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3RD. OCTOBER 1992
Charitable objects
(A)THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS AMONG THE TRUSTEES,GOVERNORS,STAFF,PUPILS FORMER TRUSTEES, FORMER GOVERNORS, FORMER STAFF, FORMER PUPILS OF ALDSWORTHS HOSPITAL THE READING BLUE COAT SCHOOL THEIR DEPENDANTS DESCENDANTS OR ANYONE CLOSELY CONNECTED WITH THE SAID SCHOOL. (B)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND RELIGION OF PUPILS AT THE SAID SCHOOL. (C)GENERALLY TO SUPPORT ANY CHARITABLE TRUSTS OR ORGANISATIONS AND TO CARRY OUT ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES. (D)TO CARRY OUT SUCH OTHER LEGALLY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BY DEED OR DEEDS EXECUTED WITH THEIR UNANIMOUS CONSENT DECLARE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 THE BULL MEADOW
STREATLEY
READING
RG8 9QD
- Phone:
- 01491875562
- Email:
- beasley_richard@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window