SCREENSKILLS LIMITED

Charity number: 1015324
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are the industry-led skills body for the UK?s screen-based creative industries, including film, high end and other television, VFX, animation and games. We work across the UK with employers, individuals, learning/training providers, trade associations, unions and government to ensure the screen industries have the skilled workforce they need. We identify training needs and help tackle them.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 November 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • SKILLSET (Working name)
  • CREATIVE SKILLSET - SECTOR SKILLS COUNCIL LIMITED (Previous name)
  • SKILLSET SECTOR SKILLS COUNCIL (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Thomas Evan Box Trustee 13 June 2024
None on record
Paul John Kearney Trustee 13 June 2024
None on record
Barry Thomas Ryan Trustee 31 May 2023
None on record
MELANIE SULLIVAN Trustee 12 October 2022
None on record
Fiona Michelle Clarke Trustee 12 October 2022
None on record
Dr Anna Celia Mallett Trustee 02 February 2022
GLYNDEBOURNE PRODUCTIONS LIMITED
Received: On time
Jane Patricia Muirhead Trustee 14 July 2021
None on record
Helen Jane Northrop Trustee 14 July 2021
None on record
Philippa Jane Childs Trustee 24 March 2021
None on record
Kathryn Lyndon Trustee 27 March 2019
None on record
Lisa Moreen Opie Trustee 04 June 2018
None on record
Arabella Clare McCabe Trustee 01 February 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.22m £11.65m £17.86m £18.39m £13.68m
Total expenditure £11.85m £9.76m £12.95m £17.03m £15.51m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £28.00k
Income from government grants £567.83k £266.90k £83.98k £608.44k £359.13k
Income - Donations and legacies £6.21m £5.16m £11.97m £12.13m £11.03m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £73.98k £17.09k
Income - Charitable activities £6.95m £6.33m £5.85m £5.90m £1.95m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £54.34k £25.71k £40.31k £287.76k £684.08k
Income - Other £1.66k £143.42k £7.42k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £11.97m £0 £11.03m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.85m £9.76m £12.95m £17.03m £15.50m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £31.85k £39.42k £42.25k £51.88k £133.69k
Expenditure - Grants institution £4.95m £4.11m £5.93m £8.26m £15.37m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £14.16k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £129.47k £89.52k £46.12k £45.86k £23.20k
Long-term investments £1 £1 £1 £1 £1
Other assets £11.62m £12.85m £19.34m £21.80m £17.78m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £5.79m £5.09m £6.63m £7.74m £5.53m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 04 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 04 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Techspace
132-140 Goswell Street
London
EC1V 7DY
Phone:
02077139800