BUSY BEES PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-school education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £136,349 from 6 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 26 November 1992: Standard registration
- BUSY BEES (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Barber | Chair | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Pinkett | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria Lai | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Joanne Rushworth | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.57k | £91.89k | £132.40k | £146.01k | £159.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.17k | £84.93k | £126.64k | £128.87k | £154.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £104.61k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £79.69k | £81.84k | £11.66k | £127.42k | £136.35k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 09 January 2024 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 09 January 2024 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 MARCH 1992
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE SOUTHWICK
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE HIVE
HOLLIS WAY
SOUTHWICK
TROWBRIDGE
WILTSHIRE
BA14 9PH
- Phone:
- 01225753262
- Email:
- busy_bees@tiscali.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window