Financial history LAKES ESTATE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1015405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £27.85k £31.90k £28.12k £36.06k £39.79k
Total expenditure £30.14k £33.23k £22.47k £33.59k £45.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £16.10k N/A N/A £6.50k