Governing document Rykneld Hall Education Trust Limited
Charity Number: 1015449

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 AUGUST 1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 2 FEBRUARY 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 MAR 2016 as amended on 27 Mar 2024 as amended on 27 Sept 2021
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN AN INDEPENDENT SCHOOL IN DERBY.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
DERBY
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.