ACTIVE CHRISTIAN TRUST (THE MEGACENTRE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of recreation and leisure facilities and activities for young people and the community. The provision of social welfare activities and programmes for the benefit of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £50,905 from 6 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 07 December 1992: Standard registration
- THE MEGACENTRE RAYLEIGH (Working name)
- THE WAREHOUSE CENTRE (Working name)
- ACTIVE CHRISTIAN TRUST (THE WAREHOUSE) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Claxton | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Paul Dolan | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
FRANCIS STANLEY CHAPMAN | Trustee | 23 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynn John Dobson | Trustee | 12 June 2020 |
|
|||||
SAMANTHA DUNLOP | Trustee | 02 June 2015 |
|
|||||
LAWRENCE CANTLE MBE | Trustee | 12 November 1992 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP GOLDSMITH | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £178.36k | £104.67k | £213.34k | £232.63k | £221.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.65k | £85.21k | £123.74k | £176.97k | £230.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £38.01k | £10.58k | £67.00k | £16.99k | £50.91k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23RD NOVEMBER 1992, AMENDED 4TH MAY 2004 AND 2ND DECEMBER 2005. as amended on 11 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
A) THE PROVISION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS FOR THE INHABITANTS OF SOUTH EAST ESSEX BEING FACILITIES: (I) OF WHICH THOSE PERSONS HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES; AND (II) WHICH WILL IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS BY PROMOTING THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING. (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
SOUTH EAST ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE MEGACENTRE
7 BROOK ROAD
RAYLEIGH
SS6 7UT
- Phone:
- 01268 779999
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window