ALMONDBURY PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Almondbury Playgroup caters for children aged 2 -4 years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £69,775 from 2 government grant(s)
People

1 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Kirklees
Governance
- 26 November 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carole Midgley | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.93k | £81.79k | £58.78k | £66.00k | £81.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.46k | £66.37k | £71.90k | £72.09k | £81.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | £69.78k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 113 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
05 April 2021
(These accounts |
31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 FEBRUARY 1992
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT ABD EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY; A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS REGARDLESS OF RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION OR MEANS. B) ENCOURAGE THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND TO PROMOTE PUBLIC INTEREST IN SUCH NEEDS. C) FURTHER THE AIM OF THE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Almondbury Playgroup
The Cabin
All Hallows School
Longcroft
Almondbury
HD5 8XW
- Phone:
- 01484304550
- Email:
- donna.burdass@ntlworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window