GUILDFORD NUMBER FIVE PROJECT, LIMITED

Charity Number: 1015474
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Night shelter for the homeless

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024

Total income: £9,184
Total expenditure: £9,184

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 December 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • NUMBER FIVE (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
EAMONN ANTHONY DELANEY Chair
None on record
Kingsley Clive Matheson-Pink Trustee 11 March 2014
None on record
Michael Patrick Combes Trustee 10 March 2013
None on record
MICHAEL STEELE Trustee
None on record
DAVID MURRAY PANNELL Trustee
None on record
PATRICIA ANN LEIGH BRIFFA Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £415.39k £12.34k £8.38k £17.00k £9.18k
Total expenditure £551.95k £12.37k £4.39k £257.08k £9.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 19 August 2024 141 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 24 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 15 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 18 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 18 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
52 HARVEY ROAD
GUILDFORD
GU1 3LU
Phone:
01483566533
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available