THE SAIGON CHILDREN'S CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Saigon Children's Charity supports severely disadvantaged children in Vietnam to escape poverty through receiving an education. Many children drop out of school early to support their families, remaining trapped in the cycle of poverty. We offer carefully targeted help to achieve positive change: building schools, giving scholarships and providing vocational training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Vietnam
Governance
- 27 November 1992: Standard registration
- 19 March 2019: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 19 March 2019: Funds transferred to 1157774 THE SAIGON CHILDREN'S CHARITY CIO
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £648.22k | £769.34k | £966.04k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £649.18k | £770.74k | £1.00m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £489.46k | £589.41k | £798.70k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £139.66k | £164.50k | £152.44k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £18.54k | £15.44k | £14.91k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £574 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £602.55k | £686.90k | £913.80k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.02k | £2.43k | £1.09k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 09 November 2017 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 31 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2ND NOVEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED 31 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY, SICKNESS, DISTRESS AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN VIETNAM.
Area of benefit
VIETNAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window