THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF FURNITURE MAKERS' CHARITABLE FUNDS INCORPORATING THE FURNISHING TRADES BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote, encourage and foster the craft and industry of furnishing and furniture and its ancilliary activities in the United Kingdom, Advance education in the industry. Relieve financial hardship of present and past employees of the Industry, their families, relatives and dependants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income:
£706,702
Donations and legacies | £88.48k | |
Charitable activities | £396.46k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £89.16k | |
Other | £132.60k |
Total expenditure:
£1,223,665
Raising funds | £352.93k | |
Charitable activities | £870.74k | |
Other | £0 |
£325,741 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £352.93k | |
Charitable expenditure | £870.74k |
People

11 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 April 2004: Standard registration
- FIT (Working name)
- FREDERICK PARKER COLLECTION (Working name)
- FURNISHING INDUSTRY TRUST (Working name)
- THE FURNITURE MAKERS' COMPANY (Working name)
- THE FURNITURE MAKERS COMPANY, THE FURNISHING INDUSTRY’S CHARITY (Working name)
- FURNISHING TRADES BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Heinrich Sigismund von der Heyde | Chair | 23 June 2016 |
|
|||||
hayden davies | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|||||
jonathan Hindle | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Benedict Burbidge | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles Vernon | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Hugh Charles Garforth-Bles | Trustee | 05 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £735.19k | £409.90k | £793.30k | £668.92k | £706.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.20m | £1.16m | £949.46k | £1.26m | £1.22m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £180.40k | N/A | £283.73k | £131.90k | £88.48k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £322.59k | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £138.24k | N/A | £319.62k | £348.72k | £396.46k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £93.80k | N/A | £83.45k | £82.82k | £89.16k | |
|
Income - Other | £165 | N/A | £106.50k | £105.49k | £132.60k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £56.00k | £0 | £5.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £838.06k | N/A | £672.55k | £905.41k | £870.74k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £365.90k | N/A | £276.90k | £357.60k | £352.93k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £67.75k | N/A | £55.77k | £68.44k | £68.60k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £38.12k | N/A | £11.99k | £21.64k | £33.19k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £29.22k | N/A | £25.12k | £26.64k | £25.48k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.35m | N/A | £3.11m | £3.01m | £2.92m | |
|
Long-term investments | £5.01m | N/A | £4.87m | £4.28m | £4.20m | |
|
Other assets | £669.86k | N/A | £669.94k | £660.72k | £551.91k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.86m | N/A | £1.72m | £1.70m | £1.61m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/10/1992 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16/11/2012 AS AMENDED ON 08 FEB 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30 OCT 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY FOR ANY PERSONS EMPLOYED OR WHO HAVE BEEN EMPLOYED IN THE FURNISHING OR ALLIED TRADES AND MEMBERS OF THEIR FAMILIES AND OTHER RELATIVES AND DEPENDANTS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF NEEDY CHILDREN OR ORPHANS OF SUCH EMPLOYEES OR FORMER EMPLOYEES WHO ARE PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY UNABLE TO MAINTAIN THEM
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Linked charities
- 15 April 2004 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Furniture Makers Co
12 Austin Friars
London
EC2N 2HE
- Phone:
- 02072565558
- Email:
- clerk@furnituremakers.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window