ADDICTIONS FORUM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 December 1992: Standard registration
- 29 August 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £825 | £47 | |
|
Total expenditure | £218 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 07 January 2008 | 433 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 OCTOBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN,AND THE STUDY OF MATTERS RELATING TO ADDICTIONS TO ALCOHOL,TOBACCO OR OTHER DRUGS AND OTHER FORMS OF DEPENDENCE ASSOCIATED WITH COMPULSIVE BEHAVIOURS,AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE CAUSES AND EFFECTS OF SUCH ADDICTIONS AND DEPENDENCIES AND THEIR TREATMENT AND PREVENTION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window