NEWTOWN CARNIVAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO RAISE FUNDS IN ORDER TO PUT ON NEWTOWN'S ANNUAL CARNIVAL WHICH INCLUDES A PROCESSION AND EVENTS IN THE TOWN HALL GROUNDS. THIS IS AN ENJOYABLE DAY OUT FOR PEOPLE OF ALL AGES ESPECIALLY THE CHILDREN. ANY SURPLUS MONEY IS THEN DISTRIBUTED TO LOCAL ORGANISATIONS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Powys
Governance
- 03 December 1992: Standard registration
- NEWTON CARNIVAL TRUST (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynda Williams | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Madeline Jones | Trustee | 10 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
CARWEN MAI JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.21k | £270 | £590 | £3.81k | £2.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.54k | £1.36k | £685 | £2.81k | £1.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 24 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11 SEPTEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY. 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. 3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION. 4) ALL OTHER PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY PERSON OR PERSONS WHO MAY FOR THE TIME BEING RESIDE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
THE PRESENT DISTRICT OF MONTGOMERYSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 Lon Glanyrafon
Newtown
SY16 1QU
- Phone:
- 01686621561
- Website:
-
newtowncarnival.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window