CORINNE BURTON MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Funding of arts therapy for cancer patients.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 04 December 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR MICHAEL JOHN BURTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Joshua Daniel March Cowan | Trustee | 26 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judith Frances Kasriel | Trustee | 12 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
NORMAN ANTHONY LEIFER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LORNA LEE COHEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LAURENCE STEPHEN BRASS | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR JEREMY BARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.05k | £46.29k | £30.82k | £32.86k | £71.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.89k | £10.99k | £40.39k | £32.81k | £43.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 November 2023 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 November 2023 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 NOVEMBER 1992 as amended on 26 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
A.THE PROMOTION OF MEDICAL RESEARCH AND IN PARTICULAR RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES OF AND A CURE FOR CANCER AND SIMILAR DISEASES.B.THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TOWARDS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE TEACHING OF ART IN SCHOOLS AND COLLEGES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ABROAD AND THE CREATION OF SCHOLARSHIPS OR BURSARIES OR PRIZES TO BE AWARDED AT SUCH SCHOOLS AND COLLEGES
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ABROAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
PARKER CAVENDISH
28 CHURCH ROAD
STANMORE
HA7 4XR
- Phone:
- 02089542727
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window