MING-AI ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PRINCIPAL ACTIVITY OF THE CHARITY IS THAT OF RUNNING ADULT EDUCATIONAL COURSES AND PROMOTING EDUCATIONAL SEMINARS AND EXCHANGES WITH THE PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF CHINA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Haringey
Governance
- 07 December 1992: Standard registration
- MING AI LONDON INSTITUTE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROF JONATHAN TAI LECK LIU | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ibrahim Sirkeci | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Wilson Ng | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hanifah Law | Trustee | 19 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Waha Kwok | Trustee | 02 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Grace Chung | Trustee | 28 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
KAH FEI HO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HOLLAND KWOK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £187.60k | £223.64k | £330.74k | £178.09k | £187.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £199.12k | £205.44k | £216.11k | £251.34k | £253.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £21.59k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 21 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 21 November 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 NOVEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN RELIGION, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH MANNER AS MAY BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ming-Ali (London) Institute
1 Cline Road
London
N11 2LX
- Phone:
- 02083617161
- Email:
- enquiry@ming-ai.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window