STAFFORDSHIRE NARROW GAUGE RAILWAY LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the education of the public in the history of the Narrow Gauge Railway and General Transport Heritage of the United Kingdom, with special emphasis to the Staffordshire area, by the creation and operation of a narrow gauge railway.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 18 December 1992: Standard registration
- 23 June 2020: Funds received from 1166251 HAMPSHIRE NARROW GAUGE RAILWAY TRUST
- AMERTON RAILWAY (Working name)
- STAFFORDSHIRE NARROW GAUGE RAILWAY SOCIETY LTD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alex Walton | Trustee | 14 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Holly Louisa Douglas | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Eivers | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Graham Martin | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter James Calvert | Trustee | 17 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Kris Jared Douglas | Trustee | 17 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
LAWRENCE EDWIN HODGKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.21k | £45.75k | £68.25k | £58.12k | £70.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.38k | £35.73k | £66.90k | £73.38k | £73.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.67k | £16.20k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 JULY 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS 3 JUNE 1992, 1 NOVEMBER 2001, 22 AUGUST 2002 AND 01 AUGUST 2007, AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION (CHANGE OF NAME) DATED 05 DECEMBER 2001 as amended on 27 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF THE NARROW GAUGE RAILWAY AND GENERAL TRANSPORT HERITAGE, WITH SPECIAL EMPHASIS TO THE STAFFORDSHIRE AREA, BY THE CREATION AND OPERATION OF NARROW GAUGE RAILWAYS, TRAMWAYS OR OTHER FORMS OF TRANSPORT.
Area of benefit
STAFFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Amerton Railway
Amerton
Stowe-by-Chartley
STAFFORD
ST18 0LA
- Phone:
- 01889271337
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window