NORDELL FAMILY FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supports the professional education of young orchestral conductors by organising and financing master classes. The beneficiaries of the charity's activities must be students or graduates of music academies in the United Kingdom or Israel.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Israel
Governance
- 09 December 1992: Standard registration
- 20 March 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE NORDELL FAMILY FOUNDATION (Working name)
- RALPH NORDELL MEMORIAL FUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.49k | £4.50k | £1.90k | £1.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £920 | £450 | £610 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 NOVEMBER 1992 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEED ON 5TH OCTOBER 1998.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A PRIZE TO A CURRENT STUDENT OR FORMER STUDENT CONDUCTING IN ANY MUSIC COLLEGE IN ENGLAND, WALES, SCOTLAND OR ISRAEL.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND, WALES, SCOTLAND AND ISRAEL,
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window