HORISTIC CHAPTER NO 2822 BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 December 1992: Standard registration
- 11 January 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2004 | 31/08/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £492 | £382 | |
|
Total expenditure | £496 | £350 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | 06 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2004 | 14 July 2005 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17TH OCTOBER 1992
Charitable objects
(1)THE RELIEF OF POOR AND DISTRESSED MEMBERS OF HORISTIC CHAPTER NO.2822 OR THEIR POOR AND DISTRESSED FAMILIES. (2)TO MAKE DONATIONS TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH MASONIC CHARITIES OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS, SOCIETIES AND OBJECTS AS THE HORISTIC CHAPTER NO.2822 SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window