BALHAM PENTECOSTAL CHURCH

Charity Number: 1015671
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious worship and the preaching of the gospel.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £63,704
Total expenditure: £69,788

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Wandsworth

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 December 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BETHEL EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BARBARA SHIRLEY MAUREEN RICHARDS Trustee
None on record
PATRICIA EILEEN MAXWELL Trustee
None on record
PASTOR BROWN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £67.17k £70.71k £59.60k £78.27k £63.70k
Total expenditure £58.08k £100.55k £58.92k £65.86k £69.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Balham Pentecostal Church
18 Balham New Road
LONDON
SW12 9PG
Phone:
02087659080