Financial history WHEELS FOR FREEDOM

Charity number: 1015680
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £55.22k £58.83k £58.03k £42.68k £57.14k
Total expenditure £51.84k £58.55k £36.50k £48.57k £58.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k £5.00k N/A £5.00k N/A