AGAPE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Fellowship meets every week for mutual encouragement and development of relationships with God and with each other. The fellowship offers support in times of difficulties in life. We also supports Christian workers both locally and abroad and train future workers. The fellowship has an ongoing ministry of feeding the homeless every Sunday.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 11 December 1992: Standard registration
- 30 December 2019: Funds received from 1110098 LONDON CHRISTIAN LEARNING CENTRE (AGAPE)
- WITHOUT BORDERS CHURCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOSEPHINE DIZON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Estralyn Murchison | Trustee | 12 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
MYLA CASTRO | Trustee | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £190.91k | £203.66k | £210.34k | £189.27k | £233.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £215.92k | £191.46k | £171.67k | £189.13k | £255.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £43.16k | £36.71k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 November 2020 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 November 2020 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 NOVEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ABROAD AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE GREATER LONDON AREA AS A CHRISTIAN CHURCH BY ANY LAWFUL AND PROPER MEANS INCLUDING (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE WORSHIP OF GOD THE PREACHING AND PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL THE TEACHING OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES THE INSTRUCTION EDIFICATION AND PASTORAL CARE OF CHILDERN AND SECONDLY THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ABROAD
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM, ABROAD AND GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
16-24 Francis Street
LONDON
E15 1JG
- Phone:
- 02085195303
- Email:
- agapecmlondon@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window