BON SECOURS HEALTH SYSTEM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 11 December 1992: Standard registration
- 02 October 2003: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 NOVEMBER 1992 AND A SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18 JANUARY 1993, 10 NOVEMBER 1993, 26 JANUARY 1994 AND 18 MARCH 1994
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK FOR THE TIME BEING CARRIED ON BY THE VOLUNTARY ASSOCIATION OF WOMEN CALLED THE CONGREGATION OF THE SISTERS OF BON SECOURS OF PARIS AND IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) THE ADVANCEMENT (SUBJECT TO AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH) OF THE HEALTH CARE MISSION, OR APOSTOLATE, OF THE CONGREGATION IN GREAT BRITAIN
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE GREAT BRITAIN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.