THE BHOPAL HOSPITAL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
None. All activities have been discontinued
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- India
Governance
- 11 December 1992: Standard registration
- 21 January 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 08 December 2019 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 05 December 2018 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 MARCH 1992
Charitable objects
A HOSPITAL WITH FACILITIES ON LAND IN BHOPAL INDIA TO BE CONSTRUCTED AND EQUIPPED; MEDICAL SURVEILLANCE BY PERIODIC MEDICAL CHECKUPS TO BE PROVIDED FOR AT LEAST 8 YEARS FROM 3 OCTOBER 1991 AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES TO BE PURSUED IN CONNECTION WITH THE OPERATION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE HOSPITAL AT BHOPAL AS THE TRUSTEES BEFORE THE END OF THE 8 YEAR PERIOD DETERMINE IN ACCORDANCE WITH CLAUSE 3.3 OF THE TRUST DEED
Area of benefit
BHOPAL INDIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window