LOWER BRADLEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Senior citizens group. Playscheme, dancing, keep fit, bingo club, mother & toddler group, karate, bowling, tenants, residents, arts & craft, disability group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 April 2022
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 14 December 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joyce horgan | Trustee | 21 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
jean hill | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHEILA HOWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR ED FELLOWS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LIL COX | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR BILL HOWL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAULINE FELLOWS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/04/2018 | 03/04/2019 | 03/04/2020 | 03/04/2021 | 03/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.28k | £9.41k | £14.14k | £0 | £571 | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.00k | £9.44k | £14.14k | £0 | £204 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Annual return | 03 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days | |
Annual return | 03 April 2022 | 20 February 2023 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 April 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 April 2020 | 25 March 2021 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/01/1987 AS AMENDED ON 17/05/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, NATIONALITY, AGE, DISABILITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT, OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE CENTRE) AND TO AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS; PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION. THE AREA OF BENEFIT SHALL BE LOWER BRADLEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD TOGETHER DEFINED BY ROYAL ESTATE AND CONSTANTINE WAY.
Area of benefit
LOWER BRADLEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD TOGETHER DEFINED BY ROYAL ESTATE AND CONSTANTINE WAY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 ROCKET POOL DRIVE
BILSTON
WV14 8BH
- Phone:
- 01902258995
- Email:
- jeanhill3@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window