THE NIKAEAN ECUMENICAL TRUST

Charity number: 1015755
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The main activity is to award grants to members of overseas Christian churches to help them to study in the UK in an Anglican setting with strong ecumenical links, in order to foster friendly and constructive links between the Church of England and other Christian Churches and nations.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £19,583
Total expenditure: £12,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 December 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
The Rt Revd Christopher Thomas James Chessun Chair 01 February 2022
THE BISHOP OF SOUTHWARK'S LENT FUND
Received: 4 days late
THE SOUTH LONDON CHURCH FUND AND SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
BACON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
THE SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
SOCIETY OF SAINT FRANCIS CENTRAL FUND
Received: On time
Rev Kirsty Louise Borthwick Trustee 01 December 2024
None on record
Rev Peniel Jesudason Rufus Rajkumar Canon Dr Trustee 13 November 2023
KING'S COLLEGE LONDON THEOLOGICAL TRUST
Received: 7 days late
Rev Jonathan Collis Trustee 23 October 2023
None on record
Revd Canon Professor Mark David Chapman Trustee 15 December 2019
None on record
Xenia Dennen Trustee 01 October 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £16.63k £15.03k £18.52k £19.88k £19.58k
Total expenditure £3.00k £5.53k £53 £14.06k £12.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 21 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
7 NUNNERY STABLES
ST. ALBANS
AL1 2AS
Phone:
01727856626
Email:
No information available
Website:

nikaeanclub.org.uk