Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF CLAREMONT SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1015799
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 February 2025 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 August 2024 187 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 March 2023 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 March 2021 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required