Financial history FRIENDS OF CLAREMONT SCHOOL

Charity number: 1015799
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.42k £1.71k £9 £3 £7
Total expenditure £2.09k £16.50k £0 £10.00k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A