MALMESBURY RIVER VALLEYS TRUST

Charity Number: 1015802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To preserve, conserve, and protect land owned by the trust, its terrestrial and aquatic life and their habitats for the benefit of the public. To advance public education in the study of and research into the river valleys and their conservation. Conygre Mead is a designated nature reserve and a County Wildlife Site.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £81,190
Total expenditure: £12,123

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 December 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Steven John Phelps Trustee 04 March 2025
None on record
James Nigel Burns Trustee 21 June 2022
None on record
Geraldine Gould Trustee 12 November 2021
None on record
Andrew Louis Kyte Trustee 08 September 2020
None on record
Stephen Davies Trustee 13 March 2020
None on record
RUSSELL WILSON Trustee 08 February 2019
None on record
Jane Deacon Trustee 19 February 2016
None on record
PETER MALCOLM BOYMAN HOWELL Trustee
None on record
LESLEY CLARE STOCKMAN BENNETT Trustee
None on record
FRANCES ANN GOLDSTONE Trustee
None on record
MP PAUL JOHN DARBY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £3.33k £1.90k £7.87k £5.15k £81.19k
Total expenditure £5.02k £6.30k £1.65k £5.87k £12.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 22 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
28 Kings Wall
Malmesbury
SN16 9BJ
Phone:
07771 707827