Accounts and annual returns THE FUND FOR EPILEPSY

Charity number: 1015822
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2007 01 August 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 08 August 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 24 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 27 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 07 March 2006 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 07 March 2006 35 days late
Annual return 31 March 2004 08 March 2005 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 08 March 2005 36 days late