Financial history ST MARYS FABRIC FUND TRUST

Charity number: 1015850
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.01k £1.00k £1.52k £1.81k £1.72k
Total expenditure £2.56k £405 £3.29k £57 £60
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A