Trustees STAMFORD GREEN SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1015916

Charity reporting is overdue by 315 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne-Marie Carlin | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Tarrant | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Trower | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louise Dennis | Trustee | 27 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Louise Druce | Trustee | 18 October 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.