HINCKLEY AND DISTRICT MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public by the provision of a museum of the history of Hinckley and Bosworth district in Leicestershire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
43 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 22 December 1992: Standard registration
- HINCKLEY MUSEUM (Working name)
- HINCKLEY AND DISTRICT MUSEUM LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EVELYN ANN CRABTREE MBE | Chair | 17 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Amy Lester | Trustee | 14 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bronwen Witherford | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
HUGH ANDREW BEAVIN | Trustee | 28 January 2016 |
|
|||||
ROBIN JEREMY BROOKS | Trustee | 14 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
PHILLIP GRAHAM LINDLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.63k | £19.70k | £14.68k | £19.01k | £33.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.36k | £17.90k | £11.30k | £13.96k | £33.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.14k | £304 | £1.29k | £500 | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 22 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 22 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION CONVERSION DATED 07 APR 2020
Charitable objects
To provide a museum to advance the education of the public in Hinckley and the surrounding area and to foster and encourage the conservation and better understanding of the material heritage and the environment for the public benefit.
Area of benefit
HINCKLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hinckley and District Museum
30 LOWER BOND STREET
HINCKLEY
LEICESTERSHIRE
LE10 1QU
- Phone:
- 01455251218
- Email:
- hinckleymuseum@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window